OH SB164 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-13)
Status: Enrolled on December 14 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Passed - Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 14 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Passed - Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 923.41, 923.48, 923.51, 959.06, 959.131, 959.99, 2901.01, 3381.17, 5743.01, 5743.021, 5743.025, 5743.03, 5743.05, 5743.33, 5743.52, 5743.54, 5743.55, 5743.56, 5743.57, 5743.59, 5743.60, 5743.62, 5743.63, and 5743.64 and to enact sections 5743.511, 5743.521, 5743.621, and 5743.631 of the Revised Code to revise the law and penalties associated with companion animal cruelty, to generally prohibit an animal shelter from destroying a domestic animal by the use of a gas chamber, and to authorize Cuyahoga County to convert its existing cigarette tax to a wholesale tax and levy a new wholesale tax on vapor products.
Title
Regards companion animal cruelty; destruction by gas chamber
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 77 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-14 | House | Passed - Amended |
2022-12-13 | House | Reported: Agriculture and Conservation |
2022-11-15 | House | Refer to Committee: Agriculture and Conservation |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Passed |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture : Animals
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Agriculture : Animals
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 01 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 81 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 43 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 43 | 021 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 43 | 025 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 43 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 43 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 43 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 43 | 511 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 43 | 52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 43 | 521 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 43 | 54 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 43 | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 43 | 56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 43 | 57 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 43 | 59 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 43 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 43 | 62 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 43 | 621 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 43 | 63 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 43 | 631 | New Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 43 | 64 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 23 | 41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 23 | 48 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 23 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 59 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 59 | 131 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 59 | 99 | Amended Code | Citation Text |