OH SB163 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-14)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Effective 9/28/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 135.35 of the Revised Code to modify the qualifications regarding notes eligible for investment of county inactive moneys.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modify qualifications for investing county inactive moneys

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-28 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-20 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-20 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-28 Effective 9/28/18
2018-06-07HousePassed
2018-03-21HouseReported: Government Accountability and Oversight
2017-11-28HouseRe-referred: Government Accountability and Oversight
2017-11-28HouseRe-referred: Rules and Reference
2017-11-01HouseReported: Financial Institutions, Housing, and Urban Development
2017-10-10HouseRefer to Committee: Financial Institutions, Housing, and Urban Development
2017-09-21HouseIntroduced
2017-09-20SenatePassed
2017-09-20SenateReported: Government Oversight and Reform
2017-06-15SenateRefer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
2017-06-13SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
135Amended CodeCitation Text
13535Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA132-SB-163
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb163/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb163/RS/01?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb163/PS/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb163/RH/03?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb163/RCH/05?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb163/RH/06?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb163/PH/07?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb163/EN/08?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA132-SB-163

Bill Comments

feedback