OH SB160 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 57-33)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 2152.86, 2717.01, 2903.03, 2929.13, 2929.20, 2930.03, 2930.06, 2930.16, 2950.01, 2951.041, 2953.08, 2967.03, 2967.12, 2967.121, 2967.19, 2967.26, 2967.28, 2971.04, 2971.05, 5120.66, 5149.07, and 5149.101 of the Revised Code to require automatic notice to victims of aggravated murder, murder, first, second, or third degree felony offenses of violence, or offenses punishable by a sentence of life imprisonment of certain prisoner or alleged juvenile offender release or transfer proceedings unless the victim has requested that the notice not be provided; to expand victim participation in parole hearings; to require the Department of Rehabilitation and Correction to provide certain information related to paroles to designated public officials; to require the Department to notify the appropriate prosecuting attorney when a felon serving a specified sentence is released pursuant to a pardon, commutation of sentence, parole, or completed prison term; to require that the Department, in cases in which a prosecuting attorney currently is notified that a Department prisoner is being considered for an early release or a specified type of transfer to a less restrictive setting, provide the prosecuting attorney and any law enforcement agency, upon request, with an institutional summary report prepared with respect to the prisoner; to make other changes related to the release of prisoners and victim's rights; to provide that voluntary manslaughter committed with a sexual motivation is a sexually oriented offense, makes an offender or juvenile offender registrant who commits it a tier III sex offender/child-victim offender, and may qualify a juvenile offender registrant who commits it as a public registry-qualified juvenile offender registrant; to waive the notice by publication requirement for a change of name if the applicant submits proof that the publication would jeopardize the applicant's personal safety; to revise the sentencing options for fourth and fifth degree felonies; and to name the victim and family notification provisions Roberta's Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To require automatic notice to victims of aggravated murder, murder, first, second, or third degree felony offenses of violence, or offenses punishable by a sentence of life imprisonment of certain prisoner or alleged juvenile offender release or transfer proceedings unless the victim has requested that the notice not be provided; to expand victim participation in parole hearings; to require the Department of Rehabilitation and Correction to provide certain information related to paroles to designated public officials; to require the Department to notify the appropriate prosecuting attorney when a felon serving a specified sentence is released pursuant to a pardon, commutation of sentence, parole, or completed prison term; to require that the Department, in cases in which a prosecuting attorney currently is notified that a Department prisoner is being considered for an early release or a specified type of transfer to a less restrictive setting, provide the prosecuting attorney and any law enforcement agency, upon request, with an institutional summary report prepared with respect to the prisoner; to make other changes related to the release of prisoners and victim's rights; to provide that voluntary manslaughter committed with a sexual motivation is a sexually oriented offense, makes an offender or juvenile offender registrant who commits it a tier III sex offender/child-victim offender, and may qualify a juvenile offender registrant who commits it as a public registry-qualified juvenile offender registrant; to waive the notice by publication requirement for a change of name if the applicant submits proof that the publication would jeopardize the applicant's personal safety; to revise the sentencing options for fourth and fifth degree felonies; and to name the victim and family notification provisions Roberta's Law.

Sponsors

Rep. Richard Adams [R]Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]Sen. Troy Balderson [R]
Rep. John Barnes [D]Rep. William Batchelder [R]Sen. Bill Beagle [R]Rep. Peter Beck [R]
Rep. Terry Blair [R]Rep. Louis Blessing [R]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Edna Brown [D]
Rep. Danny Bubp [R]Rep. Jim Buchy [R]Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. Capri Cafaro [D]
Rep. John Carney [D]Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]Rep. Ted Celeste [D]Rep. Jack Cera [D]
Rep. Kathleen Clyde [D]Sen. William Coley [R]Rep. Courtney Combs [R]Rep. Margaret Conditt [R]
Rep. Timothy Derickson [R]Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]Rep. Denise Driehaus [D]Sen. John Eklund [R]
Rep. Keith Faber [R]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]Rep. Mike Foley [D]Rep. Nancy Garland [D]
Sen. Lou Gentile [D]Rep. Cheryl Grossman [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Rep. Christina Hagan [R]
Rep. David Hall [R]Rep. Bill Hayes [R]Rep. Tracy Heard [D]Sen. Brian Hill [R]
Sen. Cliff Hite [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Sen. Jim Hughes [R]
Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Eric Kearney [D]Rep. Al Landis [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]
Rep. Thomas Letson [D]Rep. Matthew Lynch [R]Rep. Ron Maag [R]Rep. Dale Mallory [D]
Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Jeffrey McClain [R]Rep. Ross McGregor [R]Rep. Zack Milkovich [D]
Rep. Dennis Murray [D]Rep. Craig Newbold [R]Sen. Tom Niehaus [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]
Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. Mark Okey [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]
Rep. Dorothy Pelanda [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Rep. Debbie Phillips [D]Rep. Connie Pillich [D]
Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]Rep. Margaret Ruhl [R]Sen. Thomas Sawyer [D]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]
Rep. Gary Scherer [R]Rep. Barbara Sears [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Stephen Slesnick [D]
Rep. Ryan Smith [R]Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Michael Stinziano [D]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]
Rep. Matthew Szollosi [D]Sen. Louis Terhar [R]Rep. Andy Thompson [R]Sen. Nina Turner [D]
Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]Sen. Mark Wagoner [R]Sen. Christopher Widener [R]Rep. Roland Winburn [D]
Rep. Ron Young [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2012-12-13 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-22 Effective Date
2012-12-20 Governor' Action
2012-12-31 End of 10-day period
2012-12-19 Sent to Governor
2012-12-13 Concurrence
2012-05-03 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-05-03 Committee Report - S
2011-04-28 To Judiciary Criminal Justice
2011-04-28 Introduced to House
2012-12-13 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-11-14 Committee Report - S
2012-05-08 To Criminal Justice
2012-05-08 Introduced to Senate

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21Amended CodeCitation Text
2152Amended CodeCitation Text
215286Amended CodeCitation Text
27Amended CodeCitation Text
2717Amended CodeCitation Text
271701Amended CodeCitation Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2903Amended CodeCitation Text
290303Amended CodeCitation Text
2929Amended CodeCitation Text
292913Amended CodeCitation Text
292920Amended CodeCitation Text
2930Amended CodeCitation Text
293003Amended CodeCitation Text
293006Amended CodeCitation Text
293016Amended CodeCitation Text
2950Amended CodeCitation Text
295001Amended CodeCitation Text
2951Amended CodeCitation Text
2951041Amended CodeCitation Text
2953Amended CodeCitation Text
295308Amended CodeCitation Text
2967Amended CodeCitation Text
296703Amended CodeCitation Text
296712Amended CodeCitation Text
2967121Amended CodeCitation Text
296719Amended CodeCitation Text
296726Amended CodeCitation Text
296728Amended CodeCitation Text
2971Amended CodeCitation Text
297104Amended CodeCitation Text
297105Amended CodeCitation Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5120Amended CodeCitation Text
512066Amended CodeCitation Text
5149Amended CodeCitation Text
514907Amended CodeCitation Text
514910Amended CodeCitation Text
5149101Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback