OH SB134 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2743.51, 2903.06, 2903.08, 2929.14, 4510.17, 4511.181, 4511.75, 4511.751, and 4511.76 and to enact sections 5.501 and 2903.082 of the Revised Code to make changes to the law governing passing a school bus, including creating the new offense of vehicular harm, to create a new offense for vehicular homicide and vehicular assault related to improperly passing a stopped school bus, to align the penalty enhancements for vehicular homicide and vehicular assault, to make an appropriation, and to designate this the School Bus Safety Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change law regarding passing school bus

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseIntroduced
2020-02-05SenatePassed
2020-01-22SenateReported - Substitute: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
2019-06-11SenateRefer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
2019-04-22SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
27Amended CodeCitation Text
2743Amended CodeCitation Text
274351Amended CodeCitation Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2903Amended CodeCitation Text
290306Amended CodeCitation Text
290308Amended CodeCitation Text
2903082New CodeSee Bill Text
2929Amended CodeCitation Text
292914Amended CodeCitation Text
45Amended CodeCitation Text
4510Amended CodeCitation Text
451017Amended CodeCitation Text
4511Amended CodeCitation Text
4511181Amended CodeCitation Text
451175Amended CodeCitation Text
4511751Amended CodeCitation Text
451176Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback