OH SB134 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 57-36)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective 3/23/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 4501.21, 4503.772, and 4503.98 and to enact sections 1546.30, 4503.435, 4503.436, 4503.4910, 4503.4911, 4503.566, 4503.593, 4503.594, 4503.764, 4503.873, 4503.875, 4503.876, 4503.878, 4503.879, 4503.88, 4503.891, 4503.892, 4503.905, 4503.906, 4503.907, 4503.908, 4503.951, 5534.151, 5534.411, 5534.412, 5534.413, 5534.48, 5534.491, 5534.494, 5534.56, 5534.57, 5534.58, 5534.631, 5534.64, 5534.69, 5534.76, 5534.78, 5534.801, 5534.802, 5534.803, 5534.804, 5534.84, 5534.86, 5534.87, 5534.88, 5534.93, 5534.95, and 5534.97 of the Revised Code to designate multiple memorial highways, a memorial bridge, and a memorial picnic area and to amend and create multiple license plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lt Col Thomas P. Belkofer Memorial Highway

Sponsors

Sen. Randall Gardner [R]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]Sen. Charleta Tavares [D]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]
Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Edna Brown [D]Sen. Bill Beagle [R]Sen. Frank LaRose [R]
Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. William Coley [R]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]
Sen. John Eklund [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]
Sen. Kris Jordan [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]
Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]Sen. Michael Skindell [D]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]
Sen. Louis Terhar [R]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Jason Wilson [D]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]
Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Larry Householder [R]
Sen. Jim Hughes [R]Rep. Terry Johnson [R]Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]
Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]Rep. Nickie Antonio [D]Rep. Steven Arndt [R]Rep. Michael Ashford [D]
Rep. John Barnes [D]Rep. Louis Blessing [R]Rep. John Boccieri [D]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]
Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]Rep. Andrew Brenner [R]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. James Butler [R]
Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]Rep. Jack Cera [D]Rep. Kathleen Clyde [D]Rep. Hearcel Craig [D]
Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Jonathan Dever [R]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Keith Faber [R]
Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Theresa Gavarone [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]
Rep. Christina Hagan [R]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]
Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]Rep. Bernadine Kent [D]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]
Rep. George Lang [R]Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Scott Lipps [R]Rep. Eugene Miller [D]
Rep. Bill Patmon [D]Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Dorothy Pelanda [R]
Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]Rep. Bill Reineke [R]Rep. Wes Retherford [R]
Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Kristina Roegner [R]Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]
Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. Gary Scherer [R]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]
Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Rep. Andy Thompson [R]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]
Rep. Ron Young [R]

Roll Calls

2017-12-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-29 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23 Effective 3/23/18
2017-12-13SenateConcurred in House amendments
2017-12-13HousePassed
2017-12-13HouseReported - Substitute: Transportation and Public Safety
2017-12-04HouseRefer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
2017-11-30HouseIntroduced
2017-11-29SenatePassed
2017-11-16SenateReported: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
2017-04-26SenateRefer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
2017-04-20SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15New CodeSee Bill Text
1546New CodeSee Bill Text
154630New CodeSee Bill Text
45Amended CodeCitation Text
4501Amended CodeCitation Text
450121Amended CodeCitation Text
4503Amended CodeCitation Text
4503435New CodeSee Bill Text
4503436New CodeSee Bill Text
45034910New CodeSee Bill Text
45034911New CodeSee Bill Text
4503566New CodeSee Bill Text
4503593New CodeSee Bill Text
4503594New CodeSee Bill Text
4503764New CodeSee Bill Text
4503772Amended CodeCitation Text
4503873New CodeSee Bill Text
4503875New CodeSee Bill Text
4503876New CodeSee Bill Text
4503878New CodeSee Bill Text
4503879New CodeSee Bill Text
450388New CodeSee Bill Text
4503891New CodeSee Bill Text
4503892New CodeSee Bill Text
4503905New CodeSee Bill Text
4503906New CodeSee Bill Text
4503907New CodeSee Bill Text
4503908New CodeSee Bill Text
4503951New CodeSee Bill Text
450398Amended CodeCitation Text
55New CodeSee Bill Text
5534New CodeSee Bill Text
5534151New CodeSee Bill Text
5534411New CodeSee Bill Text
5534412New CodeSee Bill Text
5534413New CodeSee Bill Text
553448New CodeSee Bill Text
5534491New CodeSee Bill Text
5534494New CodeSee Bill Text
553456New CodeSee Bill Text
553457New CodeSee Bill Text
553458New CodeSee Bill Text
5534631New CodeSee Bill Text
553464New CodeSee Bill Text
553469New CodeSee Bill Text
553476New CodeSee Bill Text
553478New CodeSee Bill Text
5534801New CodeSee Bill Text
5534802New CodeSee Bill Text
5534803New CodeSee Bill Text
5534804New CodeSee Bill Text
553484New CodeSee Bill Text
553486New CodeSee Bill Text
553487New CodeSee Bill Text
553488New CodeSee Bill Text
553493New CodeSee Bill Text
553495New CodeSee Bill Text
553497New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback