OH SB134 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 17 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-01-17 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 17 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-01-17 - Effective Date
Summary
To amend sections 5301.01 and 5301.255 of the Revised Code to provide that memoranda of trust be executed and acknowledged only by the trustee of the trust instead of both the settlor and trustee.
Title
Trust memorandum-only trustee need execute
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Faber [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-01-17 | Effective Date | |
2007-10-18 | Governor Action | |
2007-10-24 | End of 10-day Period | |
2007-10-12 | Sent to Governor | |
2007-05-30 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2007-05-16 | Committee Report | |
2007-03-28 | To Judiciary Civil Justice | |
2007-03-28 | Introduced to House | |
2007-10-03 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2007-09-20 | Committee Report | |
2007-05-31 | To Civil & Commercial Law | |
2007-05-31 | Introduced to Senate |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_SB_134 |