OH SB131 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-7)
Status: Enrolled on December 14 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Passed - Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 14 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Passed - Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 109.73, 109.77, 109.771, 109.78, 109.804, 147.01, 147.63, 169.16, 173.21, 173.391, 173.422, 503.41, 715.27, 903.07, 905.321, 917.09, 917.091, 921.06, 921.11, 921.12, 921.24, 921.26, 926.30, 928.02, 943.09, 956.05, 956.06, 1315.23, 1321.04, 1321.37, 1321.53, 1321.64, 1321.74, 1322.10, 1322.21, 1513.07, 1513.161, 1514.12, 1514.47, 1531.40, 1533.051, 1533.51, 1561.14, 1561.15, 1561.16, 1561.17, 1561.18, 1561.19, 1561.20, 1561.21, 1561.22, 1565.06, 1565.15, 1707.15, 1707.151, 1707.16, 1707.161, 1707.163, 1707.165, 1717.06, 3101.10, 3301.071, 3301.074, 3307.01, 3309.011, 3319.088, 3319.22, 3319.226, 3319.229, 3319.26, 3319.261, 3319.262, 3319.27, 3319.28, 3319.301, 3319.303, 3319.361, 3327.10, 3703.21, 3704.14, 3713.05, 3717.09, 3723.03, 3723.06, 3737.83, 3737.881, 3742.05, 3743.03, 3743.16, 3743.40, 3743.51, 3748.07, 3748.12, 3769.03, 3772.13, 3772.131, 3773.36, 3773.421, 3781.10, 3781.102, 3781.105, 3916.03, 3951.03, 3951.05, 3951.09, 4104.07, 4104.101, 4104.19, 4105.02, 4169.03, 4301.10, 4508.03, 4508.04, 4508.08, 4511.763, 4701.06, 4701.07, 4701.10, 4703.08, 4703.10, 4703.33, 4703.35, 4703.37, 4707.07, 4707.072, 4709.07, 4709.08, 4709.10, 4712.02, 4713.10, 4713.28, 4713.30, 4713.31, 4713.34, 4713.37, 4713.69, 4715.03, 4715.09, 4715.10, 4715.16, 4715.27, 4715.362, 4715.363, 4715.39, 4715.42, 4715.421, 4715.53, 4715.62, 4717.05, 4717.051, 4717.07, 4717.10, 4723.08, 4723.09, 4723.26, 4723.32, 4723.41, 4723.651, 4723.75, 4723.76, 4723.85, 4725.13, 4725.18, 4725.26, 4725.48, 4725.52, 4725.57, 4725.591, 4727.03, 4728.03, 4729.09, 4729.11, 4729.15, 4729.901, 4729.921, 4730.10, 4731.151, 4731.19, 4731.293, 4731.294, 4731.295, 4731.297, 4731.299, 4731.52, 4731.572, 4732.10, 4732.12, 4732.22, 4733.18, 4733.19, 4734.23, 4734.27, 4734.283, 4735.023, 4735.07, 4735.08, 4735.09, 4735.10, 4735.27, 4735.28, 4736.10, 4736.14, 4740.05, 4740.06, 4741.12, 4741.13, 4741.14, 4741.15, 4741.19, 4743.04, 4743.041, 4747.04, 4747.05, 4747.10, 4749.12, 4751.01, 4751.15, 4751.20, 4751.201, 4751.202, 4751.21, 4751.32, 4752.05, 4752.12, 4753.07, 4753.071, 4753.072, 4753.073, 4753.08, 4753.09, 4753.12, 4755.08, 4755.09, 4755.411, 4755.44, 4755.441, 4755.45, 4755.451, 4755.48, 4755.482, 4755.62, 4755.65, 4757.18, 4758.25, 4759.05, 4759.06, 4760.03, 4760.031, 4761.04, 4761.05, 4762.03, 4763.05, 4764.10, 4765.10, 4765.11, 4765.30, 4765.55, 4767.031, 4771.08, 4773.03, 4774.03, 4775.07, 4778.03, 4778.08, 4778.09, 4779.17, 4779.18, 4781.07, 4781.08, 4781.17, 4783.04, 5123.161, 5123.45, 5126.25, 5902.02, 5903.04, 6109.04, and 6111.46; to enact sections 3746.041, 4796.01, 4796.02, 4796.03, 4796.04, 4796.05, 4796.08, 4796.10, 4796.11, 4796.12, 4796.13, 4796.20, 4796.21, 4796.22, 4796.23, 4796.24, 4796.25, 4796.26, 4796.30, and 4796.35; and to repeal sections 921.08, 1322.24, 4707.12, 4740.08, and 4757.25 of the Revised Code to require an occupational licensing authority to issue a license or government certification to an applicant who holds a license, government certification, or private certification or has satisfactory work experience in another state under certain circumstances, to specify that individuals may not register as credit services organizations, to specify that individuals may not be licensed as manufacturers or wholesalers of fireworks, and to maintain State Teacher Retirement System membership for certain school psychologists.
Title
Require occupational license if experienced in another state
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-27 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-27 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-14 | House | Passed - Amended |
2022-12-13 | House | Reported - Substitute: State and Local Government |
2022-11-15 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Passed |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Workforce and Higher Education |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Workforce and Higher Education |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Employment
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
State and Local Government
State and Local Government : State Government
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
State and Local Government
State and Local Government : State Government