OH SB13 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-8)
Status: Engrossed on July 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-24 - Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-24 - Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2152.021, 2905.32, 2929.01, and 2950.01 of the Revised Code to require a juvenile court in specified circumstances to hold a delinquency complaint in abeyance in certain cases related to prostitution or human trafficking and to provide that the elements for the offense of trafficking in persons that apply to a victim under age 16 also apply to a victim who is age 16 or 17.
Title
Apply same human trafficking offenses to all victims under 18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-17 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-24 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2019-09-23 | House | Introduced |
2019-09-23 | House | Introduced |
2019-07-17 | Senate | Passed |
2019-07-17 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Judiciary |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Sex Offenses
Juvenile and Family Law : Juvenile Justice
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Sex Offenses
Juvenile and Family Law : Juvenile Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
21 | 52 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
21 | 52 | 021 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 05 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 29 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 50 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |