OH SB127 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 8 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Concurred in House amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2305.11 and 4731.22 and to enact sections 2307.54, 2919.20, 2919.201, 2919.202, 2919.203, 2919.204, and 2919.205 of the Revised Code to prohibit the performance of an abortion on a pregnant woman when the probable post-fertilization age of the unborn child is twenty weeks or greater.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits abortion when gestational age is 20 weeks or more

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-12-08 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 64 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-12-08SenateConcurred in House amendments
2016-12-08HouseReported - Substitute: Community and Family Advancement
2016-12-08HousePassed
2015-10-01HouseRefer to Committee: Community and Family Advancement
2015-06-25HouseIntroduced
2015-06-24SenatePassed
2015-06-24SenateReported - Substitute: Health and Human Services
2015-03-17SenateRefer to Committee: Health and Human Services
2015-03-16SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23Amended CodeCitation Text
2305Amended CodeCitation Text
230511Amended CodeCitation Text
2307New CodeSee Bill Text
230754New CodeSee Bill Text
29New CodeSee Bill Text
2919New CodeSee Bill Text
291920New CodeSee Bill Text
2919201New CodeSee Bill Text
2919202New CodeSee Bill Text
2919203New CodeSee Bill Text
2919204New CodeSee Bill Text
2919205New CodeSee Bill Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4731Amended CodeCitation Text
473122Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback