OH SB111 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 49-8)
Status: Enrolled on June 24 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Passed - Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 3792.02 of the Revised Code to prohibit certain mandatory vaccinations and other activities related to an individual's vaccination status and to make an appropriation related to coronavirus local fiscal recovery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide assistance to schools and other entities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 62 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-24HousePassed - Amended
2021-06-23HouseInformally passed
2021-06-22HouseReported - Amended: Finance
2021-04-14HouseRefer to Committee: Finance
2021-03-24SenatePassed
2021-03-24SenateReported - Substitute: Finance
2021-03-03SenateRefer to Committee: Finance
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
379202New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-111
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb111/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb111/RS/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb111/PS/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb111/IN/00/sb111_00_IN?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb111/RH/03/sb111_03_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb111/PH/04/sb111_04_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15920&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16059&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16171&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16169&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16201&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16198&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17120&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17134&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17188&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17205&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17201&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17296&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-111

Bill Comments

feedback