OH SB109 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 5 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Concurred in House amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To provide grants to businesses, local fairs, child care providers, and veterans homes, to provide funds to support various programs, and to make an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide grants to businesses, fairs, child care, veterans homes

Sponsors

Sen. Nathan Manning [R]Rep. Thomas Brinkman [R]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]
Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Gary Click [R]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]Rep. Rodney Creech [R]
Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Alessandro Cutrona [R]Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]
Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]
Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. Larry Householder [R]
Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Dontavius Jarrells [D]Rep. Don Jones [R]
Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]
Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Mike Loychik [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]
Rep. Joseph Miller [D]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. Scott Oelslager [R]
Rep. Gail Pavliga [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]
Rep. Michael Skindell [D]Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Monique Smith [D]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]
Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Daniel Troy [D]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]
Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Andrea White [R]Rep. Tom Young [R]Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]
Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Jerry Cirino [R]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]
Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. Teresa Fedor [D]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]
Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]
Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. George Lang [R]Sen. Tina Maharath [D]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]
Sen. Bill Reineke [R]Sen. Mark Romanchuk [R]Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R]Sen. Kirk Schuring [R]
Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Steve Wilson [R]
Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2021-05-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-05SenateConcurred in House amendments
2021-05-05HousePassed
2021-05-05HouseReported - Amended: Finance
2021-05-04HouseRe-referred: Finance
2021-04-27HouseRe-referred: Rules and Reference
2021-03-24HouseRefer to Committee: Economic and Workforce Development
2021-03-23HouseIntroduced
2021-03-17SenatePassed
2021-03-17SenateReported: Finance
2021-03-03SenateRefer to Committee: Finance
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-109
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb109/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb109/RS/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb109/PS/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb109/RH/03?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb109/RCH/04?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb109/RH/05/sb109_05_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb109/PH/06/sb109_06_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb109/EN/07/sb109_07_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15921&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15932&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16050&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16056&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16174&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16247&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16452&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16485&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16514&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16527&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16541&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16536&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16537&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-109

Bill Comments 750

feedback