OH SB108 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Refer to Committee: Civil Justice
Pending: House Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To repeal section 1.49 of the Revised Code to eliminate the rule of construction regarding a court's considerations in determining the intention of the legislature when a statute is ambiguous.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminate rule of construction on determining legislative intent

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16HouseRefer to Committee: Civil Justice
2019-04-12HouseIntroduced
2019-04-10SenatePassed
2019-04-03SenateReported: Judiciary
2019-03-21SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback