OH SB107 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective 1/1/21 - Certain provisions effective October 17, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2301.02, 2301.03, 3517.10, 3517.105, 3517.106, 3517.1011, and 3517.11 of the Revised Code to allow certain entities to file campaign finance statements electronically , to require the Secretary of State to make the information in those electronic statements available online, and to specify that the domestic relations judge of the Franklin County Court of Common Pleas to be elected in 2020 will take office on January 3, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

File certain campaign finance statements electronically

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-01 Effective 1/1/21 - Certain provisions effective October 17, 2019
2019-06-29SenateConcurred in House amendments
2019-06-27HousePassed - Amended
2019-06-20HouseReported: State and Local Government
2019-05-14HouseRefer to Committee: State and Local Government
2019-05-13HouseIntroduced
2019-05-08SenatePassed
2019-05-08SenateReported - Amended: Government Oversight and Reform
2019-03-21SenateRefer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23Amended CodeCitation Text
2301Amended CodeCitation Text
230102Amended CodeCitation Text
230103Amended CodeCitation Text
35Amended CodeCitation Text
3517Amended CodeCitation Text
351710Amended CodeCitation Text
35171011Amended CodeCitation Text
3517105Amended CodeCitation Text
3517106Amended CodeCitation Text
351711Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback