OH SB104 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-6)
Status: Enrolled on June 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Informally passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Informally passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3302.03, 3314.03, 3326.11, 3365.03, 3365.04, 3365.05, 3365.11, and 3365.15 and to enact sections 3319.90, 3345.90, and 3365.14 of the Revised Code regarding the College Credit Plus Program and to enact the Protect All Students Act regarding single-sex bathroom access in primary and secondary schools and institutions of higher education.
Title
Regards the College Credit Plus Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 60 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | House | Informally passed |
2024-06-26 | House | Passed - Amended |
2024-06-25 | House | Reported: Higher Education |
2024-05-21 | House | Referred to committee: Higher Education |
2024-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Passed |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Workforce and Higher Education |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Referred to committee: Workforce and Higher Education |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Education
Education : Higher Education
Education : Primary and Secondary Education
House Higher Education Committee
Senate Workforce and Higher Education Committee
Education : Higher Education
Education : Primary and Secondary Education
House Higher Education Committee
Senate Workforce and Higher Education Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 02 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 14 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 19 | 90 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 26 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 45 | 90 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 65 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 65 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 65 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 65 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 65 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 65 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |