OH SB1 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 6 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Conference report agreed to
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 6 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Conference report agreed to
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 101.35, 106.021, 106.03, 106.031, 121.95, and 3701.13 and to enact sections 101.354, 101.355, 101.36, 107.57, 121.031, 121.951, 121.952, and 121.953 of the Revised Code to require certain agencies to reduce the number of regulatory restrictions in their administrative rules, to require the approval of the Joint Committee on Agency Rule Review for Department of Health orders to be effective for more than fourteen days, and to modify the Department's rulemaking authority.
Title
Reduce number of regulatory restrictions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-20 - Senate - Senate Failed (Y: 0 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | Senate | Conference report agreed to |
2020-06-04 | House | Conference managers: Reps. - Wiggam, Seitz, Kelly: Conference Committee on S.B. 1 |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Conference managers: Sens. - Schuring, Roegner, Antonio: Conference Committee on S.B. 1 |
2020-05-20 | House | Insist on amendments; asks for committee of conference |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Refused to concur in House amendments |
2020-05-06 | House | Passed |
2020-05-06 | House | Informally passed |
2020-05-06 | House | Reported - Substitute: State and Local Government |
2019-05-14 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2019-05-13 | House | Introduced |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Government Oversight and Reform |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
State and Local Government : Administrative Procedure
State and Local Government : State Government
State and Local Government : Administrative Procedure
State and Local Government : State Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 01 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 01 | 354 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 01 | 355 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 01 | 36 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 06 | 021 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 06 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 06 | 031 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 07 | 57 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 21 | 031 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 21 | 95 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 21 | 951 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 21 | 952 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 21 | 953 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 01 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |