OH HCR8 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 47-12)
Status: Passed on January 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To urge Congress to encourage the Administrator of the FMCSA to change the crash indicator BASIC regulation standards to consider only crashes in which the driver was at fault for the crash.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urge Congress-change crash indicator-show only if driver at fault.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Adopted (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-22SenateAdopted
2020-01-22SenateReported: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2020-01-22SenateManually Generate Message Element
2019-05-14SenateRefer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2019-05-02SenateOffered
2019-05-01HouseAdopted
2019-04-10HouseReported: Transportation and Public Safety
2019-03-12HouseIntroduced and Referred to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety

Subjects


Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA133-HCR-8
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/resolutions/hcr8/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/resolutions/hcr8/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/resolutions/hcr8/AH/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/resolutions/hcr8/RS/03?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/resolutions/hcr8/AS/04?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/resolutions/hcr8/EN/05?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA133-HCR-8

Bill Comments

feedback