OH HCR7 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-10)
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-13 - Referred to committee: General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-13 - Referred to committee: General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To urge Congress to make daylight saving time the permanent standard time.
Title
Urge Congress to make daylight saving time permanent
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-06 - House - House Adopted (Y: 69 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-02 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-02 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-13 | Senate | Referred to committee: General Government |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Offered |
2023-12-06 | House | Adopted |
2023-11-02 | House | Reported: State and Local Government |
2023-03-22 | House | Introduced and Referred to Committee: State and Local Government |
Subjects
House State and Local Government Committee
National or International Resolution
Senate General Government Committee
State and Local Government
Transportation
National or International Resolution
Senate General Government Committee
State and Local Government
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | 33 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |