OH HCR44 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-21)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-29 - To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate State and Local Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-29 - To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate State and Local Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To honor and commemorate veterans of the Vietnam War
Title
To honor and commemorate veterans of the Vietnam War
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-24 - House - House - Resolution Adoption (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-29 | To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs | |
2012-05-29 | Introduced to Senate | |
2012-05-24 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2012-05-10 | Committee Report | |
2012-05-01 | To Veterans Affairs | |
2012-05-01 | Introduced to House |