OH HCR13 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Reported: General Government Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To urge Congress to enact The Sunshine Protection Act of 2021, which would make daylight saving time the permanent standard time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urge Congress enact The Sunshine Protection Act of 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - House - House Adopted (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-15SenateReported: General Government Budget Committee
2021-12-15SenateRefer to Committee: General Government Budget Committee
2021-12-14SenateOffered
2021-12-09HouseAdopted
2021-11-01HouseReported: State and Local Government
2021-04-14HouseIntroduced and Referred to Committee: State and Local Government

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback