OH HCR10 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 57-9)
Status: Passed on December 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-11 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To urge the federal government to designate certain drug cartels operating as foreign terrorist organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate drug cartels as foreign terrorist organizations

Sponsors

Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]Rep. John Becker [R]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Rep. James Butler [R]
Rep. Jamie Callender [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Bill Dean [R]
Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]
Rep. Diane Grendell [R]Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. Ron Hood [R]
Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. George Lang [R]
Rep. Don Manning [R]Rep. Derek Merrin [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]
Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]
Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Gary Scherer [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Todd Smith [R]
Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Reggie Stoltzfus [R]Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Rep. Nino Vitale [R]
Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. William Coley [R]
Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. John Eklund [R]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]
Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]
Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]
Sen. Nathan Manning [R]Sen. Robert McColley [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]
Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]Sen. Michael Rulli [R]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]
Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]
Sen. Steve Wilson [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-04 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - House Adopted (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-11SenateAdopted
2019-12-04SenateReported: Judiciary
2019-07-17SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2019-06-27SenateOffered
2019-06-26HouseAdopted - Amended
2019-06-20HouseReported: Criminal Justice
2019-05-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Committee: Criminal Justice

Subjects


Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA133-HCR-10
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/resolutions/hcr10/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/resolutions/hcr10/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/resolutions/hcr10/AH/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/resolutions/hcr10/RS/03?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/resolutions/hcr10/AS/04?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_133/resolutions/hcr10/EN/05?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA133-HCR-10

Bill Comments

feedback