OH HB92 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-23)
Status: Passed on September 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-22 - Effective 9/29/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2151.421 and 2151.423 and to enact sections 2151.4210 and 3521.04 of the Revised Code and to amend Section 317.20 of H.B. 110 of the 134th General Assembly to require public children services agencies to report child abuse or neglect in military families to the appropriate military authorities, to modify the earmark promoting judicial candidate information, to create procedures for the public to submit plans to the Ohio Redistricting Commission, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require specified reporting of child abuse in military families

Sponsors

Rep. Cindy Abrams [R]Rep. Mike Loychik [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. Adam Bird [R]
Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Gary Click [R]
Rep. Erica Crawley [D]Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]
Rep. Alessandro Cutrona [R]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]
Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Diane Grendell [R]Rep. Jennifer Gross [R]
Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Larry Householder [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]
Rep. Dontavius Jarrells [D]Rep. Marilyn John [R]Rep. Mark Johnson [R]Rep. Don Jones [R]
Rep. Kris Jordan [R]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Brian Lampton [R]
Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]Rep. Beth Liston [D]
Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Derek Merrin [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Joseph Miller [D]
Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]
Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Phillip Robinson [D]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]
Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Jean Schmidt [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]
Rep. Monique Smith [D]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Jason Stephens [R]Rep. Reggie Stoltzfus [R]
Rep. Daniel Troy [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Andrea White [R]
Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]Rep. Tom Young [R]Sen. Teresa Fedor [D]
Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R]

Roll Calls

2021-09-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-22 Effective 9/29/21
2021-09-22HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2021-09-22SenatePassed
2021-09-22SenateReported - Substitute: Veterans and Public Safety
2021-03-24SenateRefer to Committee: Veterans and Public Safety
2021-03-17HousePassed
2021-03-09HouseReported - Amended: Families, Aging, and Human Services
2021-02-10HouseRefer to Committee: Families, Aging, and Human Services
2021-02-09HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2151421Amended CodeCitation Text
21514210New CodeSee Bill Text
2151423Amended CodeCitation Text
352104New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-92
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb92/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb92/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb92/PH/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb92/RS/03/hb92_03_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb92/PS/04/hb92_04_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb92/EN/05/hb92_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15622&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15838&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15948&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15980&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16088&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16091&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17413&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17411&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17417&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17423&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17432&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17599&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-92

Bill Comments

feedback