OH HB7 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-11)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 20 @ 3:30 pm in North Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 1721.21, 2101.15, 2106.13, 2108.05, 2108.06, 2108.07, 2108.23, 2108.24, 2108.34, 2111.10, 2111.50, 2133.07, 2701.10, 2717.01, 5122.15, 5804.11, 5805.06, 5816.02, 5816.05, 5816.06, 5816.09, 5816.10, and 5816.14; to amend, for the purpose of adopting a new section number as indicated in parentheses, section 2717.01 (2717.02); to enact new section 2717.01 and sections 2717.03, 2717.04, 2717.05, 2717.06, 2717.07, 2717.08, 2717.09, 2717.10, 2717.11, 2717.13, 2717.14, 2717.16, 2717.18, and 2717.19; and to repeal section 2133.16 of the Revised Code to make changes in the Probate Law, the Guardianship Law, the Ohio Trust Code, the Ohio Legacy Trust Act, the laws regarding cemetery endowment care trusts, referral of actions to a retired judge, involuntary mental health placements, and change of name procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise Probate Law, Guardianship Law, and Ohio Trust Code

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2021-03-09SenateIntroduced
2021-03-03HousePassed
2021-02-24HouseReported: Civil Justice
2021-02-04HouseRefer to Committee: Civil Justice
2021-02-03HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
172121Amended CodeCitation Text
210115Amended CodeCitation Text
210613Amended CodeCitation Text
210805Amended CodeCitation Text
210806Amended CodeCitation Text
210807Amended CodeCitation Text
210823Amended CodeCitation Text
210824Amended CodeCitation Text
210834Amended CodeCitation Text
211110Amended CodeCitation Text
211150Amended CodeCitation Text
213307Amended CodeCitation Text
213316Repealed CodeCitation Text
270110Amended CodeCitation Text
271701Amended CodeCitation Text
512215Amended CodeCitation Text
580411Amended CodeCitation Text
580506Amended CodeCitation Text
581602Amended CodeCitation Text
581605Amended CodeCitation Text
581606Amended CodeCitation Text
581609Amended CodeCitation Text
581610Amended CodeCitation Text
581614Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-7
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb7/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb7/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb7/PH/02?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15582&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15639&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15747&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15733&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15878&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16217&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-7

Bill Comments

feedback