OH HB68 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 48-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-13 - Referred to committee: Government Oversight
Pending: Senate Government Oversight Committee
Hearing: Dec 6 @ 3:00 pm in South Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-13 - Referred to committee: Government Oversight
Pending: Senate Government Oversight Committee
Hearing: Dec 6 @ 3:00 pm in South Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact sections 3109.054, 3129.01, 3129.02, 3129.03, 3129.04, 3129.05, 3129.06, 3313.5319, and 3345.562 of the Revised Code to enact the Saving Ohio Adolescents from Experimentation (SAFE) Act regarding gender transition services for minors, and to enact the Save Women's Sports Act to require schools, state institutions of higher education, and private colleges to designate separate single-sex teams and sports for each sex.
Title
Enact Ohio Saving Adolescents from Experimentation (SAFE) Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 64 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-13 | Senate | Referred to committee: Government Oversight |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-06-21 | House | Passed |
2023-06-14 | House | Reported - Substitute: Public Health Policy |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to committee: Public Health Policy |
2023-02-27 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Health and Human Services : Mental Health and Disabilities
House Public Health Policy Committee
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Senate Government Oversight Committee
Health and Human Services : Mental Health and Disabilities
House Public Health Policy Committee
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Senate Government Oversight Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31 | 09 | 054 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 29 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 29 | 02 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 29 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 29 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 29 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 29 | 06 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 13 | 5319 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 45 | 562 | New Code | See Bill Text |