OH HB674 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-8)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Effective 4/12/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-8)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Effective 4/12/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3717.22, 3717.42, 4301.01, 4301.101, 4301.24, 4301.62, 4303.021, and 4303.181 and to enact sections 4301.011, 4301.246, 4303.2011, and 4303.2012 of the Revised Code to revise specified provisions of the liquor control laws.
Title
Revises liquor laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 76 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 76 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Effective 4/12/21 | |
2020-12-22 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2020-12-18 | Senate | Passed - Amended |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Informally passed |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-06-11 | House | Passed - Amended |
2020-06-10 | House | Reported - Substitute: Commerce and Labor |
2020-05-27 | House | Refer to Committee: Commerce and Labor |
2020-05-26 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 17 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 17 | 42 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 01 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 01 | 011 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 01 | 101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 01 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 01 | 246 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 01 | 62 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 03 | 021 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 03 | 181 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
43 | 03 | 2011 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 03 | 2012 | New Code | See Bill Text |