OH HB66 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
Pending: Senate Government Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2929.01, 2929.18, and 2929.28 of the Revised Code to enact the "Theft Victims' Restitution Act" to allow restitution for the cost of accounting or auditing done to determine the extent of a victim's economic loss.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enact Theft Victims' Restitution Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateRefer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
2019-04-15SenateIntroduced
2019-04-11HousePassed
2019-03-29HouseReported - Substitute: Criminal Justice
2019-02-20HouseRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2929Amended CodeCitation Text
292901Amended CodeCitation Text
292918Amended CodeCitation Text
292928Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback