OH HB60 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Refer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate Local Government Public Safety and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 4506.01, 4506.11, 4507.01, 4507.13, and 4507.52 and to enact sections 4506.072, 4507.021, 4507.061, and 4507.511 of the Revised Code to authorize the issuance of an enhanced driver's license, enhanced commercial driver's license, and enhanced identification card to facilitate land and sea border crossings between the United States and Canada and Mexico, pursuant to an agreement with the United States Department of Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhanced IDs to facilitate crossing into Canada and Mexico

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-28SenateRefer to Committee: Local Government, Public Safety and Veterans Affairs
2017-06-22SenateIntroduced
2017-06-21HousePassed
2017-05-17HouseReported: Transportation and Public Safety
2017-02-21HouseRefer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
2017-02-13HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45Amended CodeCitation Text
4506Amended CodeCitation Text
450601Amended CodeCitation Text
4506072New CodeSee Bill Text
450611Amended CodeCitation Text
4507Amended CodeCitation Text
450701Amended CodeCitation Text
4507021New CodeSee Bill Text
4507061New CodeSee Bill Text
450713Amended CodeCitation Text
4507511New CodeSee Bill Text
450752Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback