OH HB6 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-18 - Effective 1/18/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 2927.22 of the Revised Code to prohibit a person who publishes or disseminates criminal record information from soliciting or accepting a fee to remove, correct, modify, or refrain from publishing or otherwise disseminating the information and to provide criminal and civil remedies for a violation of the prohibition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit fees for correcting criminal record information

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-27 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-18 Effective 1/18/18
2017-09-27SenatePassed
2017-09-27SenateReported: Judiciary
2017-04-05SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2017-03-16SenateIntroduced
2017-03-15HousePassed
2017-03-08HouseReported: Criminal Justice
2017-02-08HouseRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2017-02-01HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29New CodeSee Bill Text
2927New CodeSee Bill Text
292722New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback