OH HB593 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-13 - Refer to Committee: Local Government and Elections
Pending: Senate Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-13 - Refer to Committee: Local Government and Elections
Pending: Senate Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 3517.13 of the Revised Code to allow a candidate to use campaign funds to pay certain child care costs.
Title
Allow use of campaign funds to pay certain child care costs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-11-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 55 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-22 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-11-22 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-13 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Local Government and Elections |
2022-12-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-11-30 | House | Passed |
2022-11-22 | House | Reported: Government Oversight |
2022-03-22 | House | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight |
2022-03-08 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 17 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |