OH HB535 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-17)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Medicaid Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Medicaid Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 4729.01, 4729.44, 4729.75, 4729.79, and 4729.85 and to enact sections 3727.25 and 4765.45 of the Revised Code to require certain reports regarding overdoses and naloxone, to include naltrexone within the Ohio Automated Rx Reporting System, and to name this act the "Opioid Data and Communication Expansion Act."
Title
Enact Opioid Data and Communication Expansion Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-06-07 | House | Passed |
2018-04-12 | House | Reported: Community and Family Advancement |
2018-03-06 | House | Refer to Committee: Community and Family Advancement |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Health and Human Services : Mental Health and Disabilities
Public Safety
Health and Human Services : Health Care
Health and Human Services : Mental Health and Disabilities
Public Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
37 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 27 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 29 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 29 | 44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 29 | 75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 29 | 79 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 29 | 85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 65 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 65 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text |