OH HB532 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 63-22)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 3313.41, 3313.411, 3354.121, and 5913.11, to enact section 3313.412 of the Revised Code, and to amend Section 707.10 of Am. Sub. H.B. 487 of the 129th General Assembly to revise the Ohio Military Medal of Distinction law; to allow certain community colleges to acquire, construct, and maintain housing and dining facilities; to expand the areas for which a municipal corporation in Stark County may use up to 5% of its water and sewer funds for sewage or water system extensions to include areas within a joint economic development district and areas within the municipal corporation's boundaries; to temporarily permit a school district to offer highest priority to purchase an athletic field to the current leaseholder; to permit a school district to sell or lease real property directly to a STEM school in certain circumstances; and to make an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

, and to amend Section 707.10 of Am. Sub. H.B. 487 of the 129th General Assembly to revise the Ohio Military Medal of Distinction law; to allow certain community colleges to acquire, construct, and maintain housing and dining facilities; to expand the areas for which a municipal corporation in Stark County may use up to 5% of its water and sewer funds for sewage or water system extensions to include areas within a joint economic development district and areas within the municipal corporation's boundaries; to temporarily permit a school district to offer highest priority to purchase an athletic field to the current leaseholder; to permit a school district to sell or lease real property directly to a STEM school in certain circumstances; and to make an appropriation.

Sponsors

Rep. John Adams [R]Rep. Richard Adams [R]Rep. Ron Amstutz [R]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]
Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]Rep. Michael Ashford [D]Rep. Nan Baker [R]Sen. Troy Balderson [R]
Rep. William Batchelder [R]Sen. Bill Beagle [R]Rep. Peter Beck [R]Rep. Terry Blair [R]
Rep. Louis Blessing [R]Rep. Terry Boose [R]Rep. Kevin Boyce [D]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]
Rep. Danny Bubp [R]Rep. Jim Buchy [R]Rep. Armond Budish [D]Rep. James Butler [R]
Rep. Margaret Conditt [R]Rep. Timothy Derickson [R]Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]Rep. Mike Dovilla [R]
Rep. Mike Duffey [R]Rep. Keith Faber [R]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]Rep. Lorraine Fende [D]
Sen. Randall Gardner [R]Rep. Nancy Garland [D]Rep. Ronald Gerberry [D]Rep. Anne Gonzales [R]
Rep. Bruce Goodwin [R]Rep. Cheryl Grossman [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Rep. Christina Hagan [R]
Rep. David Hall [R]Rep. Bill Hayes [R]Rep. Michael Henne [R]Sen. Brian Hill [R]
Sen. Cliff Hite [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Sen. Jim Hughes [R]
Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Rep. Casey Kozlowski [R]Rep. Al Landis [R]Sen. Frank LaRose [R]
Rep. Thomas Letson [D]Rep. Matt Lundy [D]Rep. Matthew Lynch [R]Rep. Ron Maag [R]
Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Jarrod Martin [R]Rep. Jeffrey McClain [R]Rep. Zack Milkovich [D]
Rep. Dennis Murray [D]Rep. Craig Newbold [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]
Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. Mark Okey [D]Rep. Bill Patmon [D]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]
Rep. Debbie Phillips [D]Rep. Connie Pillich [D]Rep. Alicia Reece [D]Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]
Rep. Clifford Rosenberger [R]Rep. Margaret Ruhl [R]Sen. Thomas Sawyer [D]Rep. Barbara Sears [R]
Rep. Stephen Slesnick [D]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Peter Stautberg [R]
Rep. Gerald Stebelton [R]Rep. Matthew Szollosi [D]Sen. Louis Terhar [R]Rep. Andy Thompson [R]
Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]Rep. Lynn Wachtmann [R]Sen. Mark Wagoner [R]Rep. Ron Young [R]
Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2012-12-13 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-29 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 55 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-22 Effective Date
2012-12-20 Governor' Action
2012-12-31 End of 10-day period
2012-12-19 Sent to Governor
2012-12-13 Concurrence
2012-12-12 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-12-11 Committee Report - S
2012-12-04 To Finance
2012-12-04 Introduced to Senate
2012-11-29 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-11-28 Committee Report - S
2012-05-01 To *Finance & Appropriations
2012-05-01 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
307Amended CodeCitation Text
30705Amended CodeCitation Text
307051Amended CodeCitation Text
307055Amended CodeCitation Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3313Amended CodeCitation Text
331341Amended CodeCitation Text
3313411Amended CodeCitation Text
3313412New CodeSee Bill Text
3354Amended CodeCitation Text
3354121Amended CodeCitation Text
45Amended CodeCitation Text
4503Amended CodeCitation Text
450349Amended CodeCitation Text
4513Amended CodeCitation Text
4513263Amended CodeCitation Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4743Amended CodeCitation Text
474305Amended CodeCitation Text
4765Amended CodeCitation Text
476502Amended CodeCitation Text
476503Amended CodeCitation Text
476504Amended CodeCitation Text
476505Amended CodeCitation Text
476506Amended CodeCitation Text
476507Amended CodeCitation Text
476508Amended CodeCitation Text
476509Amended CodeCitation Text
476510Amended CodeCitation Text
4765101Amended CodeCitation Text
4765102Amended CodeCitation Text
476511Amended CodeCitation Text
4765111Amended CodeCitation Text
4765112Amended CodeCitation Text
4765113Amended CodeCitation Text
4765114Amended CodeCitation Text
4765115Amended CodeCitation Text
4765116Amended CodeCitation Text
476512Amended CodeCitation Text
476515Amended CodeCitation Text
476516Amended CodeCitation Text
476517Amended CodeCitation Text
476518Amended CodeCitation Text
476522Amended CodeCitation Text
476523Amended CodeCitation Text
476528Amended CodeCitation Text
476529Amended CodeCitation Text
476530Amended CodeCitation Text
476531Amended CodeCitation Text
476532Amended CodeCitation Text
476533Amended CodeCitation Text
476537Amended CodeCitation Text
476538Amended CodeCitation Text
476539Amended CodeCitation Text
476540Amended CodeCitation Text
476542Amended CodeCitation Text
476548Amended CodeCitation Text
476549Amended CodeCitation Text
476555Amended CodeCitation Text
476556Amended CodeCitation Text
4766Amended CodeCitation Text
476601Amended CodeCitation Text
476602Repealed CodeCitation Text
476603Amended CodeCitation Text
476604Amended CodeCitation Text
476605Amended CodeCitation Text
476607Amended CodeCitation Text
476608Amended CodeCitation Text
476609Amended CodeCitation Text
476610Amended CodeCitation Text
476611Amended CodeCitation Text
476612Amended CodeCitation Text
476613Amended CodeCitation Text
476615Amended CodeCitation Text
476620Repealed CodeCitation Text
476622Amended CodeCitation Text
5Amended CodeCitation Text
505Amended CodeCitation Text
50537Amended CodeCitation Text
505375Amended CodeCitation Text
50544Amended CodeCitation Text
50572Amended CodeCitation Text
55Amended CodeCitation Text
5502Amended CodeCitation Text
550201Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5709Amended CodeCitation Text
570940Amended CodeCitation Text
570973Amended CodeCitation Text
570977Amended CodeCitation Text
59Amended CodeCitation Text
5913Amended CodeCitation Text
591311Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback