OH HB515 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 42-4)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective 9/23/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 42-4)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective 9/23/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 5747.01, 5753.01, and 5753.04 of the Revised Code to exempt from income tax certain gains from the sale of an ownership interest in a business and to modify the tax laws governing sports gaming.
Title
Exempt from income tax certain gains from sale of a business
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Effective 9/23/22 | |
2022-06-01 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Passed |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-03-30 | House | Passed |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported: Ways and Means |
2022-01-25 | House | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2021-12-16 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | 47 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 53 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 53 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |