OH HB511 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-14 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 3101.01, 3101.04, and 3101.05, to enact new section 3101.02 and sections 3101.041, 3101.042, and 3109.011, and to repeal sections 3101.02 and 3101.03 of the Revised Code to make changes to the laws governing the ages at which persons may marry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change age at which can marry

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-14SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2018-07-05SenateIntroduced
2018-06-27HousePassed
2018-05-22HouseReported - Substitute: Community and Family Advancement
2018-02-20HouseRefer to Committee: Community and Family Advancement
2018-02-14HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
31Amended CodeCitation Text
3101Amended CodeCitation Text
310101Amended CodeCitation Text
310102Repealed CodeCitation Text
310103Repealed CodeCitation Text
310104Amended CodeCitation Text
310105Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback