OH HB5 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-13 - Referred to committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Dec 6 @ 9:30 am in North Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-13 - Referred to committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Dec 6 @ 9:30 am in North Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2101.24, 2151.412, 2151.414, 2937.02, 3107.01, 3107.011, 3107.02, 3107.03, 3107.04, 3107.05, 3107.055, 3107.06, 3107.07, 3107.08, 3107.082, 3107.083, 3107.084, 3107.11, 3107.12, 3107.14, 3107.16, 3107.161, 3107.17, 3107.18, 3107.19, 3107.46, 5103.15, 5103.153, and 5103.16; to amend, for the purpose of adopting a new section number as indicated in parentheses, section 3107.051 (3107.052); to enact new section 3107.051 and section 3107.20; and to repeal sections 3107.071 and 3107.13 of the Revised Code to modernize adoption laws.
Title
Modernize the adoption process
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-13 | Senate | Referred to committee: Judiciary |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-06-27 | House | Passed |
2023-06-20 | House | Reported - Substitute: Families and Aging |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to committee: Families and Aging |
2023-02-15 | House | Introduced |