OH HB5 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Effective 9/14/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Effective 9/14/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 117.47 and to enact sections 117.473, 117.48, 2743.31, and 2744.11 of the Revised Code to allow the Auditor of State to conduct feasibility studies regarding the efficiency of local public offices and state agencies, to authorize the Auditor of State to establish a shared equipment service agreement program among state agencies and political subdivisions, and to specify that a state agency or political subdivision that uses the loaned equipment may assume potential liability for its use.
Title
Prepare case studies of public offices/share equipment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-14 | Effective 9/14/16 | |
2016-05-24 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Passed |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Government Oversight and Reform |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported - Amended: Local Government |
2015-01-29 | House | Refer to Committee: Local Government |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 17 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 17 | 473 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 17 | 48 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
27 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 43 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 44 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 44 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |