OH HB497 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-9)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-15 - Refer to Committee: Primary and Secondary Education
Pending: Senate Primary and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-15 - Refer to Committee: Primary and Secondary Education
Pending: Senate Primary and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3301.0711, 3301.163, and 3313.608 of the Revised Code to eliminate retention under the Third Grade Reading Guarantee.
Title
Eliminate retention under the Third Grade Reading Guarantee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-15 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Primary and Secondary Education |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-06-01 | House | Passed |
2022-05-25 | House | Reported: Primary and Secondary Education |
2021-12-07 | House | Refer to Committee: Primary and Secondary Education |
2021-11-29 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 01 | 0711 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 01 | 163 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | 608 | Amended Code | Citation Text |