OH HB494 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 1349.61, 4111.03, 4111.14, 4113.15, 4113.16, 4121.01, 4123.01, 4123.30, 4123.38, 4123.77, 4141.01, and 5747.01 of the Revised Code to specify that a franchisor is not the employer of a franchisee or employee of a franchisee for purposes of the Minimum Fair Wage Standards Law, the Bimonthly Pay Law, the Workers' Compensation Law, the Unemployment Compensation Law, and the Income Tax Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarify status of franchisees for social insurance programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 68 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26SenateIntroduced
2018-06-20HousePassed
2018-03-21HouseReported - Amended: Government Accountability and Oversight
2018-02-14HouseRefer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight
2018-02-05HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
13Amended CodeCitation Text
1349Amended CodeCitation Text
134961Amended CodeCitation Text
41Amended CodeCitation Text
4111Amended CodeCitation Text
411103Amended CodeCitation Text
411114Amended CodeCitation Text
4113Amended CodeCitation Text
411315Amended CodeCitation Text
411316Amended CodeCitation Text
4121Amended CodeCitation Text
412101Amended CodeCitation Text
4123Amended CodeCitation Text
412301Amended CodeCitation Text
412330Amended CodeCitation Text
412338Amended CodeCitation Text
412377Amended CodeCitation Text
4141Amended CodeCitation Text
414101Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5747Amended CodeCitation Text
574701Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback