OH HB482 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To create a Tax Fraud Study Commission to study and make recommendations for preventing income tax fraud.
Title
Create a Tax Fraud Study Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 84 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-03-30 | House | Passed |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means |
2021-11-09 | House | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2021-11-08 | House | Introduced |