OH HB481 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Effective 6/19/20 - Emergency: effective 06/19/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Effective 6/19/20 - Emergency: effective 06/19/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 124.393, 5165.01, 5165.15, 5165.16, 5165.17, 5165.19, 5165.26, and 5166.01 and to repeal section 5165.361 of the Revised Code and to amend Section 333.10 of H.B. 166 of the 133rd General Assembly and Section 812.10 of H.B. 529 of the 132nd General Assembly, and to repeal Section 333.270 of H.B. 166 of the 133rd General Assembly to authorize the conveyance of state-owned real property, to provide for the distribution of some federal coronavirus relief funding to local subdivisions, to revise the formula used to determine Medicaid rates for nursing facility services, to exclude loan amounts forgiven under the federal CARES Act from the commercial activity tax, to allow a county, township, or municipal corporation appointing authority to establish a mandatory cost savings program in response to COVID-19, to allow certain state employees' salaries and pay supplements to be frozen during the pay period that includes July 1, 2020, through the pay period that includes June 30, 2021, to make capital reappropriations for the biennium ending June 30, 2022, to make other appropriations, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Authorize conveyance of state-owned real property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-06 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | Effective 6/19/20 - Emergency: effective 06/19/2020 | |
2020-06-11 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed - Amended |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Reported: General Government and Agency Review |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Refer to Committee: General Government and Agency Review |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-05-20 | House | Passed |
2020-05-06 | House | Reported - Substitute: State and Local Government |
2020-01-29 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2020-01-27 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 24 | 393 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 65 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 65 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 65 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 65 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 65 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 65 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 65 | 361 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
51 | 66 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |