OH HB480 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3)
Status: Enrolled on December 13 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-13 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 13 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-13 - Concurred in Senate amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2329.152, 2329.17, 2329.211, 2329.28, 2329.52, 4707.01, 4707.023, 4707.15, 4707.20, and 4707.22 of the Revised Code to establish requirements governing multi-parcel auctions and to amend Ohio's foreclosure procedures.
Title
Establish requirements for multi-parcel auctions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-05 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-13 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Passed - Amended |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Informally passed |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Agriculture |
2018-09-25 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Agriculture |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-06-27 | House | Passed |
2018-05-22 | House | Reported: Civil Justice |
2018-01-30 | House | Refer to Committee: Civil Justice |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Agriculture
Commerce
Courts and Civil Law
Housing and Real Property
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Commerce
Courts and Civil Law
Housing and Real Property
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
23 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
23 | 29 | 152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | 29 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | 29 | 211 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | 29 | 28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
23 | 29 | 52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 07 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 07 | 023 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 07 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 07 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 07 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |