OH HB459 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 60-35)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To enact section 5.091 of the Revised Code to declare that Ohio is a "Purple Heart State."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To declare that Ohio is a "Purple Heart State."

Sponsors

Rep. John Adams [R]Rep. Richard Adams [R]Rep. Ron Amstutz [R]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]
Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]Rep. Michael Ashford [D]Rep. Nan Baker [R]Rep. John Barnes [D]
Rep. William Batchelder [R]Rep. Peter Beck [R]Rep. Terry Blair [R]Rep. Louis Blessing [R]
Rep. Kevin Boyce [D]Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Edna Brown [D]
Rep. Danny Bubp [R]Rep. Jim Buchy [R]Rep. Armond Budish [D]Rep. John Carney [D]
Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]Rep. Ted Celeste [D]Rep. Jack Cera [D]Rep. Kathleen Clyde [D]
Rep. Courtney Combs [R]Rep. Margaret Conditt [R]Rep. Rex Damschroder [R]Rep. Timothy Derickson [R]
Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]Rep. Mike Dovilla [R]Rep. Denise Driehaus [D]Rep. Mike Duffey [R]
Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]Rep. Lorraine Fende [D]Sen. Randall Gardner [R]Rep. Nancy Garland [D]
Rep. Ronald Gerberry [D]Rep. Anne Gonzales [R]Rep. Bruce Goodwin [R]Rep. Jay Goyal [D]
Rep. Cheryl Grossman [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Rep. Christina Hagan [R]Rep. Robert Hagan [D]
Rep. David Hall [R]Rep. Bill Hayes [R]Rep. Tracy Heard [D]Rep. Michael Henne [R]
Sen. Brian Hill [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]
Rep. Casey Kozlowski [R]Rep. Al Landis [R]Sen. Frank LaRose [R]Rep. Thomas Letson [D]
Rep. Matt Lundy [D]Rep. Matthew Lynch [R]Rep. Ron Maag [R]Rep. Dale Mallory [D]
Rep. Jarrod Martin [R]Rep. Mary Matheney [R]Rep. Jeffrey McClain [R]Rep. Ross McGregor [R]
Rep. Zack Milkovich [D]Rep. Craig Newbold [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Rep. Mark Okey [D]
Rep. Bill Patmon [D]Rep. Dorothy Pelanda [R]Rep. Connie Pillich [D]Rep. Alicia Reece [D]
Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]Rep. Philip Rose [R]Rep. Clifford Rosenberger [R]Rep. Margaret Ruhl [R]
Rep. Gary Scherer [R]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]Rep. Barbara Sears [R]Rep. Marilyn Slaby [R]
Rep. Stephen Slesnick [D]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Peter Stautberg [R]
Rep. Gerald Stebelton [R]Rep. Michael Stinziano [D]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Rep. Matthew Szollosi [D]
Sen. Louis Terhar [R]Rep. Andy Thompson [R]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]Rep. Lynn Wachtmann [R]
Rep. Roland Winburn [D]Rep. Ron Young [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-23 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-22 Effective Date
2012-12-20 Governor' Action
2012-12-31 End of 10-day period
2012-12-19 Sent to Governor
2012-12-13 Concurrence
2012-12-13 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-12-06 Committee Report
2012-05-24 To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs
2012-05-24 Introduced to Senate
2012-05-23 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-05-09 Committee Report
2012-02-16 To State Government & Elections
2012-02-16 Introduced to House

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback