OH HB451 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 53-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-04 - Reported - Substitute: Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-04 - Reported - Substitute: Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 149.43 and 149.45 of the Revised Code to exclude from the definition of public record under the Public Records Law any depiction by photograph, film, videotape, or digital, visual, or printed material of victims of crime under specified circumstances dealing with the victims' bodily privacy, to exclude from that definition specified residential and familial information regarding county or multicounty corrections officers, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Exclude depictions of crime victim's body from public records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-04 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Judiciary |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-03-21 | House | Passed |
2018-02-28 | House | Reported - Substitute: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2018-01-16 | House | Refer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2017-12-13 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Sex Offenses
State and Local Government : Public Records
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Sex Offenses
State and Local Government : Public Records
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 49 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 49 | 43 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 49 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |