OH HB45 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-12 - To Judiciary Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Judiciary - Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 2923.121, 2923.128, and 2923.16 of the Revised Code to permit a concealed carry licensee to possess a firearm in any liquor permit premises, or any open air arena, for which a D permit has been issued if the licensee is not consuming liquor or under the influence of alcohol or a drug of abuse and to modify the offense of improperly handling firearms in a motor vehicle as it applies to concealed carry licensees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To permit a concealed carry licensee to possess a firearm in any liquor permit premises, or any open air arena, for which a D permit has been issued if the licensee is not consuming liquor or under the influence of alcohol or a drug of abuse and to modify the offense of improperly handling firearms in a motor vehicle as it applies to concealed carry licensees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-11 - House of Representatives - House - Third Consideration (Y: 56 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House of Representatives - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House of Representatives - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 61 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House of Representatives - House - Amendment (Y: 32 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-11 - House of Representatives - House - Amendment (Y: 23 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-11 - House of Representatives - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 62 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-11 - House of Representatives - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-12 To Judiciary Criminal Justice
2011-05-12 Introduced to Senate
2011-05-11 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2011-03-16 Committee Report
2011-01-26 To State Government & Elections
2011-01-26 Introduced to House

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2923Amended CodeCitation Text
2923121Amended CodeCitation Text
2923128Amended CodeCitation Text
292316Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback