OH HB433 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-24 - Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-24 - Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 1901.01, 1901.02, 1901.03, 1901.07, 1901.08, 1901.31, and 1907.11 of the Revised Code to abolish the Sandusky County County Court, to create the Sandusky County Municipal Court, to provide that the judge of the Sandusky County Municipal Court shall be nominated by petition, to designate the clerk of courts of Sandusky County the clerk of the Sandusky County Municipal Court, to abolish the Trumbull County County Court, to create the Trumbull County Municipal Court, to create a full-time judgeship for the Trumbull County Municipal Court, and to provide that the judge be nominated by petition and elected in 2017 for a six-year term.
Title
To abolish the Sandusky County County Court, to create the Sandusky County Municipal Court, to provide that the judge of the Sandusky County Municipal Court shall be nominated by petition, to designate the clerk of courts of Sandusky County the clerk of the Sandusky County Municipal Court, to abolish the Trumbull County County Court, to create the Trumbull County Municipal Court, to create a full-time judgeship for the Trumbull County Municipal Court, and to provide that the judge be nominated by petition and elected in 2017 for a six-year term.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-12 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 92 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-15 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-24 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-05-23 | Committee Report - S | |
2012-05-16 | To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs | |
2012-05-16 | Introduced to Senate | |
2012-05-15 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2012-05-03 | Committee Report | |
2012-01-31 | To Local Government | |
2012-01-31 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
19 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
19 | 01 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 01 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
19 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
19 | 07 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |