OH HB430 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 41-3)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Effective 9/13/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 41-3)
Status: Passed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Effective 9/13/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3743.75, 5709.20, 5709.211, 5709.212, 5709.22, and 5739.02 of the Revised Code to modify the language governing the sales and use tax exemption for certain kinds of property used in the production of oil and gas and to extend the moratorium on new fireworks manufacturer and wholesaler licenses.
Title
Expand sales tax exemption for oil and gas production property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Passed (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Passed (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | Effective 9/13/18 | |
2018-06-07 | House | Concurred in Senate amendments |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Passed |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Rules and Reference |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Re-referred: Rules and Reference |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-31 | House | Passed |
2018-01-25 | House | Reported: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2017-12-04 | House | Refer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2017-11-29 | House | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
37 | 43 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 43 | 75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 09 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 09 | 211 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 09 | 212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 09 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 39 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 39 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |