OH HB429 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-18 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-18 - Effective Date
Summary
To amend sections 5703.70, 5739.03, 5739.033, 5739.034, 5739.24, 5741.03, and 5741.05 and to enact section 5739.061 of the Revised Code and later to repeal sections 5739.035, 5739.123, 5739.24, and 5740.10 of the Revised Code to require vendors to utilize origin-based sourcing for intrastate sales beginning January 1, 2010, to discontinue compensation of impacted counties for sales tax losses incurred under destination-based sourcing, to compensate vendors required to convert from destination-based sourcing to origin-based sourcing, to permit a vendor, when making a refund, to retain the amount of the delivery charge and sales taxes attributable to the charge, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Sales tax-convert to origin-based sourcing/discontinue tax loss compensation
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Gibbs [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-18 | Effective Date | |
2008-04-18 | Governor Action | |
2008-04-18 | End of 10-day Period | |
2008-04-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2008-04-01 | Concurrence | |
2008-03-12 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2008-03-12 | Committee Report | |
2008-02-21 | To Ways & Means & Economic Development | |
2008-02-21 | Introduced to Senate | |
2008-02-19 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2008-02-07 | Committee Report | |
2008-01-10 | To Ways & Means | |
2008-01-10 | Introduced to House |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_HB_429 |