OH HB412 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-10)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-11 - Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-11 - Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 1.64, 2133.211, 2151.3515, 2305.113, 2925.61, 3701.92, 3727.06, 3729.05, 4123.01, 4123.026, 4123.46, 4503.44, 4723.01, 4723.06, 4723.07, 4723.18, 4723.181, 4723.48, 4723.482, 4723.50, 4729.01, 4730.01, 4730.02, 4730.03, 4730.04, 4730.06, 4730.08, 4730.091, 4730.10, 4730.101, 4730.11, 4730.12, 4730.13, 4730.14, 4730.19, 4730.21, 4730.22, 4730.25, 4730.251, 4730.27, 4730.28, 4730.31, 4730.32, 4730.33, 4730.38, 4730.39, 4730.41, 4730.42, 4730.43, 4730.431, 4730.49, 4730.51, 4730.53, 4731.07, 4761.01, 4761.17, 4765.01, 4765.51, 5122.11, 5122.111, and 5123.47; to amend, for the purpose of adopting new section numbers as indicated in parentheses, section 4730.091 (4730.201) and 4730.092 (4730.202); to enact new section 4730.20 and sections 4723.489, 4730.111, and 4730.203; and to repeal sections 4730.081, 4730.09, 4730.15, 4730.16, 4730.17, 4730.18, 4730.20, 4730.44, 4730.45, 4730.46, 4730.47, 4730.48, 4730.50, and 4730.52 of the Revised Code to revise the law governing the practice of physician assistants, the practice of advanced practice registered nurses, eligibility for compensation and benefits under Ohio's Workers' Compensation Law, the proceedings for court-ordered treatment of a mentally ill person, and the licensure of recreational vehicle parks and recreation camps, and to amend the versions of sections 4730.25 and 4730.53 of the Revised Code that are scheduled to take effect April 1, 2015, to continue the provisions of this act on and after that effective date.
Title
That are scheduled to take effect April 1, 2015, to continue the provisions of this act on and after that effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-11 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-12-11 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-05-15 | To *Rules | |
2014-05-15 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-05-14 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-04-02 | Committee Report - S | |
2014-01-21 | To Health and Aging | |
2014-01-21 | Introduced to House |