OH HB41 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-12)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Refer to Committee: Health
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 149.43 of the Revised Code to exempt certain mental health care providers' residential and familial information from disclosure under the Public Records Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempt mental health care providers' info from Public Records Law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17SenateRefer to Committee: Health
2021-03-16SenateIntroduced
2021-03-10HousePassed
2021-03-03HouseReported: Civil Justice
2021-02-04HouseRefer to Committee: Civil Justice
2021-02-03HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
14943Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-41
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb41/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb41/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb41/PH/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb41/IN/00/hb41_00_IN?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb41/RH/01/hb41_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb41/PH/02/hb41_02_PH?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15566&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15665&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15844&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15871&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16099&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16105&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-41

Bill Comments 750

feedback