OH HB404 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-17)
Status: Passed on November 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-22 - Effective 11/22/20 - Emergency: effective 11/22/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend Sections 10 and 11 of H.B. 164 of the 133rd General Assembly, Sections 10, 11 as subsequently amended, 12, 13, and 17 as subsequently amended of H.B. 197 of the 133rd General Assembly, Section 27 of H.B. 481 of the 133rd General Assembly, as subsequently amended, and Section 7 of S.B. 216 of the 132nd General Assembly, as subsequently amended, to continue essential operations of state and local government in response to the declared pandemic and global health emergency related to COVID-19 and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allow state university trustees attend meetings electronically

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-22 Effective 11/22/20 - Emergency: effective 11/22/20
2020-11-19HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2020-11-18HouseAmendments laid over under the rule
2020-11-18SenatePassed
2020-11-18SenateReported - Substitute: Government Oversight and Reform
2020-09-01SenateRefer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
2020-05-15SenateIntroduced
2020-05-13HousePassed
2020-05-13HouseReported: Higher Education
2019-11-18HouseRefer to Committee: Higher Education
2019-11-12HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33New CodeSee Bill Text
3345New CodeSee Bill Text
334582New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback