OH HB4 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 11 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-12-11 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 6301.22 of the Revised Code regarding the governor's office of workforce transformation and industry-recognized credentials and certificate programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Develop industry-recognized credential and certificate programs

Sponsors

Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. Gil Blair [D]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]
Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Janine Boyd [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. James Butler [R]
Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Randi Clites [D]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]
Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Anthony DeVitis [R]Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]
Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]
Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Diane Grendell [R]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]
Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]
Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]
Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]
Rep. Don Manning [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Riordan McClain [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]
Rep. Joe Miller [D]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]
Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Rick Perales [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]
Rep. Bill Reineke [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]
Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]
Rep. Kent Smith [D]Rep. Todd Smith [R]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]
Rep. Emilia Strong Sykes [D]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]
Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]Rep. Paul Zeltwanger [R]

Roll Calls

2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-11SenatePassed
2019-12-11SenateReported: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
2019-07-17SenateRefer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce
2019-06-10SenateIntroduced
2019-06-06HousePassed
2019-06-05HouseReported - Substitute: Economic and Workforce Development
2019-05-21HouseRefer to Committee: Economic and Workforce Development
2019-05-16HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3313Amended CodeCitation Text
33136113Amended CodeCitation Text
3333Amended CodeCitation Text
333394Amended CodeCitation Text
63New CodeSee Bill Text
6301New CodeSee Bill Text
630122New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback