OH HB388 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To enact sections 3902.50, 3902.51, 3902.52, 3902.53, and 3902.54 of the Revised Code regarding out-of-network care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards out-of-network health care

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-20 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-26SenateIntroduced
2020-05-20HousePassed
2020-05-20HouseReported - Substitute: Finance
2019-11-06HouseRefer to Committee: Finance
2019-11-05HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
39New CodeSee Bill Text
3902New CodeSee Bill Text
390250New CodeSee Bill Text
390251New CodeSee Bill Text
390252New CodeSee Bill Text
390253New CodeSee Bill Text
390254New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback